WA HB1913 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expiring the international services tax preference.
Title
Expiring the international services tax preference.
Sponsors
Rep. Julio Cortes [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2023-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |