WA HB1903 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Washington adult diploma and workforce training program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Washington adult diploma and workforce training program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-05HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.

Same As/Similar To

SB5891 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback