WA HB1902 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting consumer ease, administrative simplification, and cost efficiency by requiring a single bill for health services covered by a qualified health plan.
Title
Promoting consumer ease, administrative simplification, and cost efficiency by requiring a single bill for health services covered by a qualified health plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1902&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1902.pdf |