WA HB1889 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 6/30/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 6/30/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the fruit and vegetable district fund.
Title
Concerning the fruit and vegetable district fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Effective date 6/30/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Chapter 46, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-23 | House | APPG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-23 | House | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-23 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2013-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |