WA HB1860 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing homelessness among persons discharging from inpatient behavioral health settings.
Title
Preventing homelessness among persons discharging from inpatient behavioral health settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Chapter 215, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | BH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 12:30 PM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 6:00 PM. |
2022-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-15 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 320 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |