WA HB1854 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the annexation of territory by regional fire protection service authorities.
Title
Concerning the annexation of territory by regional fire protection service authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Chapter 271, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-08 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2011-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-24 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-24 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-16 | LG - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | LG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-07 | First reading, referred to Local Government. |