WA HB1844 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Innovation, Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Innovation, Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring modular contracting for information technology procurement by state agencies.
Title
Requiring modular contracting for information technology procurement by state agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1844&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1844.pdf |