WA HB1829 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the LeMay-America's Car Museum special license plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the LeMay-America's Car Museum special license plate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2024-01-08HouseReferred to Transportation.
2024-01-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-03-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2023-03-06HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-02-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-23HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-23HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM.
2023-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2023-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

SB5738 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - On motion, referred to Transportation.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4604New CodeSee Bill Text
4617220Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4618200Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4668420Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1829&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1829.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1829-S.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1829%20AMH%20FEYJ%20HIRS%20045.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1829%20HBA%20TR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1829%20HBR%20TR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67514
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67553
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67760
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1829%20HBA%20TR%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69185
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=69624
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=129236&actionText=TR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30825&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback