WA HB1801 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning city use of state-owned aquatic lands for a publicly owned marina.
Title
Concerning city use of state-owned aquatic lands for a publicly owned marina.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-14 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Same As/Similar To
SB5504 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1801&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1801.pdf |