WA HB1800 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - Referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - Referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning filing a petition seeking termination of parental rights.
Title
Concerning filing a petition seeking termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-04-24 | House | On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to House Rules 3. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted as amended. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-17 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |