WA HB1790 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 7/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 7/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the creation, display, and material durability of temporary license plates.
Title
Addressing the creation, display, and material durability of temporary license plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Eric Robertson [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Brandy Donaghy [D] |
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 7/1/2023. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 132, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:00 PM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 16a | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 16a | 305 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 17 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |