WA HB1782 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding constraints of expenditures for WorkFirst and child care programs.
Title
Regarding constraints of expenditures for WorkFirst and child care programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Early Learning & Human Services. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-07 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2011-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-04 | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. | |
2011-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-04 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-23 | WAYS - Majority; do pass ELHS 11 bill proposed by Early Learning & Human Services. | |
2011-02-23 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-10 | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-10 | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-10 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-08 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-02 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |