WA HB1781 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the land use petition act.
Title
Amending the land use petition act.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Sen. Drew Hansen [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |