WA HB1777 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 7/6/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the financing of early learning facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the financing of early learning facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseEffective date 7/6/2017.
2017-07-06HouseChapter 12, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session.
2017-07-06HouseGovernor signed.
2017-06-30HouseDelivered to Governor.
2017-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-30HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-30SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-06-30SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-06-30SenatePlaced on second reading.
2017-06-30SenateRules suspended.
2017-06-30SenateFirst Reading.
2017-06-29SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2017-06-29SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-06-29SenateFloor amendment
2017-06-29SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2017-06-29SenateRules suspended.
2017-06-26SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-05-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-05-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2017-05-23SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-05-05SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-05-02SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 6.
2017-05-02SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-04-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-03-31SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2017-03-31SenateMinority; do not pass.
2017-03-31SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM.
2017-03-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-03-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-03-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-08House2nd substitute bill substituted
2017-03-07HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-23HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-23HouseCB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-22HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Capital Budget.
2017-02-08HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-08HouseELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-30HouseFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services

Same As/Similar To

SB5753 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1777&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1777.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1777-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1777-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1777-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1777-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1777-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1777&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1777&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=05-02-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1777&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=05-25-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1777&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=06-29-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1777&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=06-30-2017

Bill Comments

feedback