WA HB1756 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning solitary confinement.
Title
Concerning solitary confinement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5639 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
Subjects
CORRECTIONAL FACILITIES AND JAILS
CORRECTIONS, DEPARTMENT
SHERIFFS AND POLICE CHIEFS, WASHINGTON ASSOCIATION OF (WASPC)
VULNERABLE ADULTS
CORRECTIONS, DEPARTMENT
SHERIFFS AND POLICE CHIEFS, WASHINGTON ASSOCIATION OF (WASPC)
VULNERABLE ADULTS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
72 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
72 | 09 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 68 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |