WA HB1742 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 28 @ 4:00 pm in Senate Committee on Ways & Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning nontax statutes administered by the department of revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning nontax statutes administered by the department of revenue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28SenateScheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM
2023-03-24SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2023-03-22SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2023-03-22SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2023-03-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM.
2023-03-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
2023-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2023-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2023-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-22HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-03HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1902085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19150060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19150080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19240080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19240900Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5918312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5918595Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6330New CodeSee Bill Text
6330040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6330690Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8826020Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1742&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1742.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1742%20HBA%20FIN%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1742%20HBR%20FIN%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1742%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1742%20SBA%20LAW%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1742%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1742%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128836&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30830&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128836&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1742&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128836&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31046&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback