WA HB1742 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile offenses that involve depictions of minors.
Title
Concerning juvenile offenses that involve depictions of minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-24 | House | Chapter 128, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |