WA HB1740 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the community economic revitalization board.
Title
Concerning the authority of the community economic revitalization board.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamila Taylor [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. April Berg [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5586 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-13 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.