WA SB5586 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the community economic revitalization board.
Title
Concerning the authority of the community economic revitalization board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1740 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-01 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM.