WA HB1740 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a health benefit exchange.
Title
Establishing a health benefit exchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-03-22 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-07 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2011-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-04 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-04 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | WAYS - Majority; do pass HCW 11 bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness. | |
2011-02-24 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-17 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-17 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-07 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-01 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5445 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-11 - Effective date 7/22/2011.