WA HB1734 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing reimbursement for substitute teachers participating in activities of the Washington state professional educator standards board to carry out its powers and duties.
Title
Authorizing reimbursement for substitute teachers participating in activities of the Washington state professional educator standards board to carry out its powers and duties.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-14 | House | Chapter 17, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-14 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB5548 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.