WA HB1729 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revised for 1st Substitute: Creating and expanding tax incentives for the research, development, deployment, production, and sale of hydrogen fuel products in Washington state.Original: Creating and expanding tax incentives for the research, development, production, and sale of hydrogen fuel products in Washington state.
Title
Revised for 1st Substitute: Creating and expanding tax incentives for the research, development, deployment, production, and sale of hydrogen fuel products in Washington state.Original: Creating and expanding tax incentives for the research, development, production, and sale of hydrogen fuel products in Washington state.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Abbarno [R] | Rep. Mark Klicker [R] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] |
Rep. Suzanne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Greg Cheney [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2023-03-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2023-03-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-09 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-03-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |