WA HB1729 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Washington blockchain work group.
Title
Establishing the Washington blockchain work group.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Dave Paul [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |
2022-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |