WA HB1719 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Effective date 3/4/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Effective date 3/4/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning use and acquisition of military equipment by law enforcement agencies.
Title
Concerning use and acquisition of military equipment by law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Effective date 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Chapter 3, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2022-01-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-01-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-20 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2021-12-30 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |