WA HB1710 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Washington state cannabis commission.
Title
Establishing a Washington state cannabis commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2021-12-28 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
41 | 06 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |