WA HB1709 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing safety measures for tow truck operators and vehicles.
Title
Addressing safety measures for tow truck operators and vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] |
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-01 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-12-28 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5635 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-25 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 37 | 196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 61 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |