WA HB1707 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the wearing of personal flotation devices on kayaks, canoes, and stand-up paddleboards.
Title
Requiring the wearing of personal flotation devices on kayaks, canoes, and stand-up paddleboards.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-18 | House | CED - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |
2021-12-28 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |