WA HB1703 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing fiscal notes for legislation that uniquely affects school districts.
Title
Addressing fiscal notes for legislation that uniquely affects school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Alexander [R] | Rep. Edwin Anderson [R] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] |
Rep. Kevin Parker [R] | Rep. Timothy Probst [D] | Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-20 | Chapter 140, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-20 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-14 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-11 | President signed. | |
2011-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-23 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-16 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-04 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | Floor amendment | |
2011-02-25 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | APPE - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-31 | First reading, referred to Education Appropriations & Oversight. |