WA HB1701 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system benefits.
Title
Concerning law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Chapter 125, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-27 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2021-12-27 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5652 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 26 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 26 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 26 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 45 | 0604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 45 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 45 | 158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |