WA HB1692 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the authority of the board of directors of a public facilities district.
Title
Addressing the authority of the board of directors of a public facilities district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-24 | Chapter 167, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-22 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-16 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-10 | President signed. | |
2009-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-07 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | CEDT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | CEDT - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development & Trade. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5874 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.