WA HB1672 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing recorking wine at wineries and tasting rooms.
Title
Allowing recorking wine at wineries and tasting rooms.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | House | Chapter 169, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-07 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |