WA HB1646 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the equal pay opportunity act by amending and enhancing enforcement of the equal pay act and protecting worker communications about wages and employment opportunities.
Title
Enacting the equal pay opportunity act by amending and enhancing enforcement of the equal pay act and protecting worker communications about wages and employment opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM failed. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2016-02-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2015-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-11 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-09 | House | LAB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-09 | House | LAB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Labor |
Same As/Similar To
SB5630 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.