WA HB1637 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a court to mitigate a criminal sentence when the defendant was experiencing mental illness at the time of the offense.
Title
Allowing a court to mitigate a criminal sentence when the defendant was experiencing mental illness at the time of the offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Committee on Public Safety: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-27 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2021-12-13 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |