WA HB1637 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prescription review for medicaid managed care enrollees.
Title
Concerning prescription review for medicaid managed care enrollees.
Sponsors
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] |
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1637&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1637.pdf |