WA HB1635 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning disproportionate share hospital adjustments.
Title
Concerning disproportionate share hospital adjustments.
Sponsors
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-21 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-18 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-13 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-13 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |