WA HB1634 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding architects.
Title
Regarding architects.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Rep. Larry Crouse [R] |
Rep. Hans Dunshee [D] | Rep. Jim Jacks [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Scott White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2010-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Commerce & Labor. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | APPG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:30 AM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-02-06 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-06 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-06 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-30 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5529 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010*.