WA HB1628 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the supply of affordable housing by modifying the state and local real estate excise tax.
Title
Increasing the supply of affordable housing by modifying the state and local real estate excise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-14 - House - House Committee on Finance: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-04-14 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-04-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2023-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-10 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 45 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 45 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 45 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 46 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |