WA HB1598 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approving the entry of Washington into the agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote.
Title
Approving the entry of Washington into the agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-12 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-19 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5599 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-28 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1598&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1598.pdf |