WA HB1595 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the definition of labor hours for the purposes of the apprenticeship utilization statute.
Title
Changing the definition of labor hours for the purposes of the apprenticeship utilization statute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-22 | House | Chapter 48, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2015-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-10 | House | LAB - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | LAB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-09 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Labor |