WA HB1576 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales and use tax for cities to offset municipal service costs to newly annexed areas.
Title
Concerning sales and use tax for cities to offset municipal service costs to newly annexed areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-25 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB5864 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - Effective date 6/9/2016.