WA HB1570 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning access to homeless housing and assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning access to homeless housing and assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-15HouseChapter 85, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-15HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HousePassed final passage; yeas, 54; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2018-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-28SenateCommittee amendment
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-23SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-23SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-23SenateHSC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
2018-02-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 51; nays, 47; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-07SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-07Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-01-26SenatePlaced on second reading.
2018-01-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-22SenateAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-22SenateExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-18SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateReferred to Appropriations.
2018-01-08SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-07-20SenateReturned to House Rules 3.
2017-06-23SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-06-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-05-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2017-05-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-05-25HouseFloor amendment
2017-05-25House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-05-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-24HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
2017-02-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-17HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-02-16HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-16HouseCDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1570&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1570.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1570-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1570-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1570-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1570-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1570-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1570-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1570&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=05-25-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1570&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-07-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1570&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1570&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2018

Bill Comments

feedback