WA HB1558 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the taxation of honey beekeepers.
Title
Concerning the taxation of honey beekeepers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |
2013-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass FIN 13 bill proposed by Finance. |
2013-03-01 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2013-03-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2013-02-28 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-28 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |