WA HB1541 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing prescription drug cost transparency.
Title
Addressing prescription drug cost transparency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5401 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.