WA HB1533 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the disclosure of certain information of agency employees or their dependents who are survivors of domestic violence, sexual assault, harassment, or stalking.
Title
Exempting the disclosure of certain information of agency employees or their dependents who are survivors of domestic violence, sexual assault, harassment, or stalking.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharlett Mena [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Mary Fosse [D] | Rep. April Berg [D] | Rep. Jamila Taylor [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Emily Alvarado [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Clyde Shavers [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Effective date 5/15/2023. |
2023-05-15 | House | Chapter 458, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2023-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-10 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5746 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-16 - First reading, referred to State Government & Elections.