WA HB1533 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the transfer of a firearm donated to a historical society or museum for temporary exhibition and the transfer of the firearm back to the donor from the background check requirement.
Title
Exempting the transfer of a firearm donated to a historical society or museum for temporary exhibition and the transfer of the firearm back to the donor from the background check requirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Christopher Hurst [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Scott [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Graham Hunt [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] |
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] |
Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Kevin Parker [R] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1533&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1533.pdf |