WA HB1531 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning medical debt.
Title
Concerning medical debt.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | House | Chapter 227, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5530 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.