WA HB1521 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting warehousing and manufacturing job centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting warehousing and manufacturing job centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseEffective date 7/1/2021.
2021-04-16HouseChapter 83, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-27SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-17SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-16SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-16SenateBFST - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
2021-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-03HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-03House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-19HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-10HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Same As/Similar To

SB5446 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8214New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1521&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1521.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1521-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1521-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1521-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1521-S.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1521-S%20AMH%20ENTE%20OBRT%20121.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1521%20HBA%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1521%20HBR%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1521-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1521-S.E%20SBA%20BFST%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1521-S.E%20SBR%20BFST%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1521-S.E%20SBR%20BFST%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1521-S.E%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1521-S.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1521-S.E%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1521-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1521-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124477&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28671&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124477&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1521&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124477&actionText=BFST%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28696&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124477&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28969&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124477&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-06-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1521&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback