WA SB5446 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Business, Financial Services & Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting warehousing and manufacturing job centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting warehousing and manufacturing job centers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2021-02-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.

Same As/Similar To

HB1521 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/1/2021.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8214New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback