WA HB1517 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring comparable coverage for patients who require orally administered anticancer medication.
Title
Requiring comparable coverage for patients who require orally administered anticancer medication.
Sponsors
Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Bill Hinkle [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on 281 Schmick Pg 1 Ln 5 (Y: 46 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on 281 Schmick Pg 1 Ln 5 (Y: 46 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-22 | Chapter 159, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-22 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-13 | Passed final passage; yeas, 79; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-03-22 | HEA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-07 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2011-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-04 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-17 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-25 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |