WA HB1516 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making lunar new year a state legal holiday.
Title
Making lunar new year a state legal holiday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-15 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |